Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daynara Savinon, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Neimark, Marshall A, against Garnerville Holding Company, Inc., represented by Cascone, Leonard Michael, Pagliuca, Anthony, Rogoff-Gribbins, Beth L, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time637 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 19, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 20, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 15, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 09, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 22, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 23, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 07, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 23, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 20, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 09, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 12, 2016SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: March 07, 2017SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 22, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: January 06, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Discontinued Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
September 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter Withdrawing SJ Motion |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Defendant's 6-23-17 letter (document # 47) |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiff's 6-23-17 letter (document # 46) |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Docket List as of 7-19-17 @ 3:05PM |
|
July 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Gerald E. Loehr Supreme Trial, SETT (10:00 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter with new TRC date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.