Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
296 North Main Street Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sullivan, Robert Michael, against First Class Electrical Contractors, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 19, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: May 17, 2022JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: May 17, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
||
May 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment with Notice of Entry |
||
May 18, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 17, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
May 17, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION Proposed Judgment on Default |
||
May 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 17, 2022 | ||
May 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Affirmation in support of claim for legal fees per Court's Order |
||
December 28, 2021 | Admission of Service by NY Secretary of State | ||
December 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service of Motion upon First Class electrical Contractors, LLC |
||
December 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Merit of Joseph Fisch |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.