Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Phadia Jean, Vladimir Jean, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Crown, Valerie J, Crown, Valerie J., against Orangetown Police Department, Orangetown Police Officer, Orangetown Town Of, represented by Magrino, Robert V, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Abuse Of Process) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 28, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 01, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 23, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 05, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 03, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 26, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 01, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 02, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 18, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 27, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 31, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 31, 2018ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: May 29, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 10, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 07, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: August 17, 2018SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 31, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 10, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 01, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 31, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 14, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 24, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 26, 2016CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: August 23, 2016CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: January 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: October 05, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 31, 2018NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 04, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: September 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2018CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: October 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003) ANSWER Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 07, 2019CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: September 24, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 08, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005) 50-h transcript of Phadia Jean Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: March 07, 2019CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: January 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 22, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: September 01, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2018RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2018CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: February 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: March 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005) Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 30, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005) IME Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 21, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: April 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 27, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 27, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 06, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: March 31, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 24, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 07, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: May 21, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 27, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 31, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 16, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #005) omitted from previous e-filing due to extensive redactions
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: November 17, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: December 17, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 30, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 18, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiffs' Combined Demands as to Third-Party Defendants |
||
January 18, 2023 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
January 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #006) Decision and Order with Notice of Entry |
||
November 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 17, 2022 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
November 16, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 04, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 04, 2022 | ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.