Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Phillips, Elliot, Sitzer, Ira R, Unger, Meredith E, against Marybeth Dermody, M.B.'S Sidestreet Salon, Inc., represented by Marino, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 07, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: October 18, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: January 03, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 13, 2017ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Hearing |
VIRTUAL
Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
December 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued NAES Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
October 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Motion Submission Part Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
October 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued NAES/MOT FILED Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
October 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued NAES/CONTROL FOR MOTION Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #002) Decided: 12/21/2020Denied Before Justice: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
September 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Held VIRTUAL Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for party address (CPLR 3118) |
|
July 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Held PC ORDER Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.