Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Esther Dipilato, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Isaac, Brian J., Subin, Herbert S, against Alfred Dottario Jr., Andrew Scibelli, Anthony Dipilato, Sj Fuel Co. Inc., represented by Lebowitz, Ira H., Mclellan, Kenneth Andrew, Roussel, Keith Robert Martin, Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Orlando Marrazzo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management694 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #4K)
Date: August 03, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 08, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #4K)
Date: November 23, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2K)
Date: November 21, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1K)
Date: March 05, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 06, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 28, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6K)
Date: October 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1K)
Date: March 05, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 14, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) Certified copy of police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 13, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 02, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1K)
Date: March 05, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 15, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1K)
Date: March 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 27, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2017ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 06, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 10, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 04, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM
Date: July 14, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: November 29, 2021ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: November 23, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 02, 2018ANSWER
Date: March 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3K)
Date: August 02, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 06, 2018ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: June 01, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: July 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3K)
Date: August 02, 2018NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 02, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2019NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: April 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1K) Police Report_Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 15, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1K) June 5, 2017 Answer
Date: February 16, 2018DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: February 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4K)
Date: August 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3K)
Date: August 02, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3K)
Date: November 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1K)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #005) Police Report for 09.01.16 Accident Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5K) Police report dated 8/15/16 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5K)
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 29, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3K)
Date: November 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3K) Police Accident Report (redacted) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1K)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1K)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4K)
Date: August 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4K)
Date: August 03, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: December 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6K)
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5K)
Date: October 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6K)
Date: October 29, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6K)
Date: October 29, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3K)
Date: November 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4K)
Date: November 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3K)
Date: November 19, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: December 14, 2018COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES
Date: December 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6K)
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2019BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6K)
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 25, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Â (Motion #4K)
Date: December 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 19, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3K)
Date: November 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #6K)
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 15, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 10, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 18, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 18, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 16, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: August 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 06, 2023ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 17, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 23, 2023ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE Â (Motion #1K)
Date: December 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4K)
Date: August 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2018SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: December 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1K)
Date: February 16, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4K)
Date: August 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2K)
Date: August 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
March 22, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #009) Court order |
||
March 17, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #009) no fee letter |
||
March 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #009) prior motion for LNOC |
||
March 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
March 09, 2023 | ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | ||
March 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.