Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Carmel Richmond Health Care And Rehabilitation Center, Orest Babchuk, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Pontone, Michael Jay Santino, Trochez, Andrea Marie, against Aon National Flood Services, Kah Insurance Brokerage Inc., Norma Blackman, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, represented by Esposito, Anne Marie, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Supreme with Alan C Marin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Richmond. The plaintiff, Orest Babchuk, is suing The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Aon National Flood Services, and Kah Insurance Brokerage Inc. The ...
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)
Date: September 04, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 19, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 19, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 20, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 19, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: September 20, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 16, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 30, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: August 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 03, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 23, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 25, 2022COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Continuing Response to Demands for Discovery and Inspection
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 30, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 06, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 09, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 01, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 23, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2022DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: June 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 03, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry |
||
August 16, 2022 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL Answer to Third-Party Complaint |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #006) Amended Complaint and Answers |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Third-Party Pleadings |
||
August 08, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #006) Statement of Material Facts |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) Bills of Particulars |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #006) J.K.S. by Keith Schaffer Deposition Transcript |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Motion and Court Order |
||
August 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.