Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-R7, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Jacob, Leah Nicole, Lazar, Steven, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint, Ken Weber A K A Kenneth J. Weber, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 6) See All represented by Harrison, David Mark, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with PETER G. GEIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 02, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 23, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 06, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 21, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004) REFEREES OATH AND REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: November 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Notice to Admit
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2020HARDSHIP DECLARATION - PROOF OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT ATTESTING NO RECEIPT
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 06, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 27, 2018FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: April 02, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: May 07, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 27, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: May 28, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: December 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 21, 2018FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: February 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATES OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 21, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004) AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT AND AMOUNT DUE
Date: June 12, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Letter of Resumption |
||
September 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud ... show more |
||
September 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
July 13, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Letter of Abeyance |
||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) AFFIMRATION OF SERVICE |
||
July 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
June 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #004) REFEREES OATH AND REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE REFEREES OATH AND REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
June 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #004) ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
||
June 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #004) ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.