Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Newrez Llc F K A New Penn Financial, Llc Dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cascino, Margaret Jaffe, Lawrence, Peter Adel, Mcnamara, Megan Katherine, Ryan, Eileen Marie, Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, (total of 5) See All against John Doe, Sherri Lynn Taliento A K A Sherri L. Taliento, Thomas Taliento A K A Thomas Taliento, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with EVA MASTRO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEVA MASTRO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Exhibit D (Assignments of CEMA-Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Exhibit F (Assignments of First Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002) Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 19, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Exhibit C (Loan Modification Agreement) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 12, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Exhibit E (First Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A (Lost Note Affidavit) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023OATH
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Exhibit B (CEMA-Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002) First Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002) Oath & Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002) SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002) CEMA-Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002) Second Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Exhibit G (Second Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Exhibit H (Business Records and Loan History) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001) H-SUMMONS & COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 04, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: June 09, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: July 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2019RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 17, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: February 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 02, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: March 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: October 21, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 17, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 23, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 28, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE NOTICE OF SERVICER CHANGE PURSUANT TO PART 202 UNIFORM CIVIL RULES 202.12-a(b)(1) |
||
November 16, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing, Notice of Servicer Change | ||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Loan Modification Agreement Redacted |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Successive Notice of Pendency |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Motion for a Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
November 07, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion for Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
November 07, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) First Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR First Mortgage Redacted |
||
November 07, 2023 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #002) Costs of Plaintiff |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #002) Affirmation of Regularity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.