Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank, N.A., Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Owner Trustee Of New Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-Rpl3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Komosinski, Richard F, Mckniff, Christopher Michael, against Bank Of America Successor In Interest To Fleet National Bank, Batia Tal, Hod Tal, John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten, New York City Department Of Finance, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConference Part Foreclosure Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D DEMANDS
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 03, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 03, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE | ||
December 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 09, 2021 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
July 09, 2021 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
July 09, 2021 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
July 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Tenants - COULD NOT VERIFY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.