Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Incorvaia, Christina Alicia, Zegarelli, Thomas Matthew, against American Express Centurion Bank, Avi Foox, John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Rab Performance Recoveries Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Manaugh, Sara Linda, Tillona, Thomas Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConference Part Foreclosure Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003) Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 11, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 16, 2023FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003) Affidavit in support of MSJ
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 03, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 03, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: February 03, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 24, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: September 21, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 21, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 14, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: June 09, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: July 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: November 08, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #003) Richmond County Clerk Online Records |
||
September 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003) Affidavit of Mailing Affidavit of Mailing Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 11, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003) Amended Answer |
||
September 11, 2023 | FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION | ||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) affidavits of service |
||
September 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003) Affidavit in support of MSJ Affidavit in support of MSJ Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Answer 1 |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Amend Answer Order |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) S&C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.