Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Marygael Jumao-As, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Spitzer, Stuart Terence, against Ahold Delhaize Usa Company, The Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc, represented by Capitolo, Christine M., Goldman, Michael Ian, Shafeek, Sasha Shaneza Shana, Torino, Bruce A, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall Down) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint was filed in Queens County Court in New York. The plaintiff, Marygael Jumao-As, is suing Ahold Delhaize USA Company and The Stop and Shop Supermarket Company LLC as defendants. The complaint alleges that on December 15, 2020, while the...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024ANSWER
Date: October 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) G. Linn Evans (Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc.) |
||
January 24, 2024 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Maria Silvestri (Stop & Shop Supermarkets) |
||
October 24, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Preserve |
||
October 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS to Deft. THE STOP AND SHOP SUPERMARKET COMPANY LLC. |
||
October 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS to Deft. AHOLD DELHAIZE USA INC. S/H/A AHOLD DELHAIZE USA COMPANY |
||
October 09, 2023 | Answer and Demands | ||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.