Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sean A Gadsden, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davidoff, Ruben, against Agnaldo B Gouvea, Derosa Sports Construction, Inc., represented by Lesperance, Nicole Emley, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Robert Ian Caloras presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Queens County. The plaintiff, Sean A. Gadsden, is suing the defendants, Agnaldo B. Gouvea and Derosa Sports Construction, Inc. The complaint alleges that on May 11, 2023, the pla...
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 15, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 15, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 15, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Statement of undisputed Material facts |
||
January 15, 2024 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for BP with affirmation of service |
||
January 15, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of service |
||
January 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Affidavit in Support |
||
January 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) MV104 signed by plaintiff-operator |
||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support |
||
January 15, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 15, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
November 15, 2023 | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.