Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kiran Kumar Chenna, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bieber, Bruce Wayne, Peters, Jeffrey Scott, against Mona Shah A K A Mehreen Shah, Mona Shah & Associates, Pllc, Nadim Ahmed A K A Nadim Khan, Nuride Transportation Group, Llc, Nyc Green Transportation Group, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Biging, Peter Jon, Feinberg, Matthew H., in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Joseph J Risi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed by Kiran Kumar Chenna against NYC Green Transportation Group, LLC, NuRide Transportation Group, LLC, Nadim Ahmed, Mona Shah, and Mona Shah & Associates, PLLC. Kiran Kumar Chenna is an individual residing in New Jersey. NYC Gr...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2024COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 09, 2024ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: November 15, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023SUMMONS
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NuRide Transportation Group, LLC - Verified Amended Complaint |
||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC Green Transportation Group, LLC - Verified Amended Complaint |
||
January 10, 2024 |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Stipulation Accepting Service of Verified Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Verified A Stipulation Accepting Service of Verified Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Verified A ... show more |
||
January 09, 2024 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Verified Amended Complaint with Exhibit |
||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Offering Memo |
||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Complaint |
||
November 15, 2023 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #001) | ||
November 15, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Retainer Agreement |
||
November 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.