Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sheng Lin , Suing Individually And Derivatively On Behalf Of Oriental Palm Springs, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Yang, Brian, against Oriental Palm Springs, Inc. , Nominal Defendant, Sin Chow Chen, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Joseph J Risi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Sheng Lin against Sin Chow Chen and Oriental Palm Springs, Inc. The complaint alleges breaches of fiduciary duties and other violations by Sin Chow Chen, who is a shareholder and manager of Oriental Palm Sp...
AFFIRMATION
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2023EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 10, 2023SUMMONS
Date: August 10, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION *Corrected*
Date: August 10, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 10, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 10, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE defendant: Oriental Palm Springs Inc. |
||
August 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE defendant: Sin Chow Chen |
||
August 25, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 15, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 11, 2023 | Affirmation of Emergency | ||
August 11, 2023 |
EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER (Motion #001) Affirmation of Emergency |
||
August 10, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Plaintiff's affidavit |
||
August 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F acknowledgement of payment and ownership dated 09/01/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.