Related Content
in Queens County
Ruling
2024CUPT025243 IN THE MATTER OF: LILIANA WALKER
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Tentative Ruling
2024CUPT025243: IN THE MATTER OF: LILIANA WALKER
07/17/2024 in Department 21
OSC - Name Change
The morning calendar in courtroom 21 will normally begin between 8:30 and 8:45 a.m. Please
arrive at the courtroom no later than 8:30 a.m. The door will be opened before the calendar is
called.
The Court allows appearances by CourtCall but is not equipped for Zoom. If appearing by
CourtCall, call in no later than 8:15 a.m. If you intend to appear by CourtCall, you must make
arrangements with CourtCall by 4:00 p.m. the day before your scheduled hearing. Requests for
approval of a CourtCall appearance made on the morning of the hearing will not be granted. No
exceptions will be made.
With respect to the tentative ruling below, no notice of intent to appear is required. If you wish to
submit on the tentative ruling you can fax notice to Judge Riley's secretary, Ms. Sedillos at
805-289-8705, stating that you submit on the tentative. You may also email the Court at:
Courtroom21@ventura.courts.ca.gov with all counsel copied on the email. Do not call in lieu of
sending a fax or email. If you submit on the tentative without appearing and the opposing party
appears, the hearing will be conducted in your absence. If you are the moving party and do not
communicate to the Court that you submit on the tentative or you do not appear at the hearing,
the Court may deny your motion irrespective of the tentative.
Unless stated otherwise at the hearing, if a formal order is not signed at the hearing, the
prevailing party shall prepare a proposed order and comply with CRC 3.1312 subdivisions (a),
(b), (d) and (e). The signed order shall be served on all parties and a proof of service filed with
the court. A "notice of ruling" in lieu of this procedure is not authorized.
Tentative Ruling
The Court GRANTS Petitioner’s Petition changing petitioner’s name to Carmen Liliana Bonilla
Morales.
Analysis
The Petition appears properly filled out and otherwise sufficient.
Petitioner is a 63 year-old female residing in Simi Valley.
The CLETS run came back with no disqualifying hits. It does not appear that Petitioner is
under the jurisdiction of the CDCR (Code Civ. Proc., §1279.5, subd. (c)) or a registered sex
offender (Code Civ. Proc., §1279.5, subd. (f)).
2024CUPT025243: IN THE MATTER OF: LILIANA WALKER
The Court’s May 29, 2024 OSC ordered Petitioner to publish a copy of the OSC in the Ventura
County Star for four consecutive weeks, as required by Code of Civil Procedure, section 1277,
subdivision (a). Proof of publication has been filed and the petition will be granted.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: KRISTIN TIANA KABOUREK
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01521
Case Number:
24STCP01521
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
The criminal history assessment that the Courts Clerks Office has run through CLETS reveals that Petitioner has multiple active outstanding warrants. Reference
#W317936055 and #W960254166
Petitioner must clear the outstanding warrant and file evidence of such before the Court will rule on the petition for name change. The OSC and hearing on the petition for name change are continued to September 9, 2024 at 9:30 am. No later than two weeks before the continued OSC and hearing, Petitioner must file written proof that the outstanding bench warrant has been fully addressed and resolved. Failure to do so will result in the OSC and hearing on the petition being taken off calendar without prejudice to be placed back on calendar upon filing of proof that all outstanding warrants have been cleared.
The Court Clerk is to run a new criminal history assessment prior to the continued OSC to verify that the warrant has been cleared.
In addition, no proof of publication has been
filed. Petitioner must file proof of
publication no later than one week before the continued (September 9, 2024)
hearing date. Failure to do so will
result in denial and dismissal of the petition without prejudice. Court Clerk to give notice.
The Court Clerk is to give notice to all parties.
Ruling
WHITTAKER VS GRAY
Jul 20, 2024 |
FL-19-002701
FL-19-002701 – WHITTAKER VS GRAY
Petitioner’s Request for Order re Enforce Judgment, etc.—HEARING REQUIRED.
The Court finds that proof of service is on file and reflects valid and timely individual mail service of Respondent as required. (Fam. Code, § 215(a).) Respondent did not file a Responsive Declaration or written opposition. Consequently, the Court is inclined to grant the requested relief.
However, a final judgment is already an “order” that the parties are bound to comply with and a further order to comply by the Court would be redundant. That said, Petitioner’s claims all relate to that part of the judgment dealing with division of pension plans and this has not been accomplished due to Respondent’s non-cooperation.
Accordingly, the Court will not further delay proceedings by again ordering Respondent’s cooperation and, instead, finds good cause to appoint the clerk of the Court as elisor to sign the QDRO and other necessary papers on Respondent’s behalf. But Petitioner must first submit a proposed order with the exact documents to be signed attached to it for review and approval by the Court. (Local Rules, rule 7.08(A).) Petitioner is free to use all the means to obtain information provided by the Civil Discovery Act if documents or other information has not been provided by Respondent. (Fam. Code, § 218.) And the Court will reserve jurisdiction over the issue of monetary sanctions against Respondent for the necessity of Petitioner having to file post-judgment motions to obtain Respondent’s compliance.
Ruling
KENDRA TRUSSELL vs. ANDREW BATE
Jul 19, 2024 |
24FC08645
No appearances necessary. The Petition for Dissolution was filed January 12, 2024. A Proof of Service (FL-115) is filed. More than 30 days have passed since service and no Response is filed. Petitioner must file the form FL-165 and request entry of default and proceed to default judgment. Petitioner is referred to the court’s Family Law Facilitator for assistance in proceeding with default. The FLF is available via email at selfhelp@amadorcourt.org. Further case management is scheduled for November 5, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3. A Family Law CMC Statement must be filed and served at least 15 days prior to the CMC. (https://www.amadorcourt.org/localForms/familyLaw/FamilyLaw_CMC-STATEMENT.pdf
Ruling
ELIDA ROMERO vs. HERIBERTO FRANCO GOMEZ
Jul 19, 2024 |
24FC08636
No appearances necessary. The petition for dissolution was filed on January 5, 2024 and a response was filed on June 12, 2024. After review of the CMC statements, the parties are ordered to serve their Preliminary Financial Disclosures (FL-140) and file a Declaration Regarding Service (FL-141) before the next court appearance. Further case management is scheduled for December 3, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3. A Family Law CMC Statement must be filed and served at least 15 days prior to the CMC. (https://www.amadorcourt.org/localForms/familyLaw/FamilyLaw_CMC-STATEMENT.pdf)
Ruling
CHRISTINA JOHNSTON vs. PAUL S JOHNSTON
Jul 19, 2024 |
24FC08664
No appearances necessary. The Petition for Dissolution was filed on January 29, 2024. A Proof of Service (FL-115) is filed. More than 30 days have passed since service and no Response is filed. Petitioner must file the form FL-165 and request entry of default and proceed to default judgment. Petitioner is referred to the court’s Family Law Facilitator for assistance. The FLF is available via email at selfhelp@amadorcourt.org. Further case management is scheduled for November 15, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3. A Family Law CMC Statement must be filed at least 15 days prior to the CMC. (https://www.amadorcourt.org/localForms/familyLaw/FamilyLaw_CMCSTATEMENT.pdf
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: ANDY ALFREDO LICONA-SALVADOR, ET AL.
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01551
Case Number:
24STCP01551
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
The petition is CONTINUED to September 9, 2024 at 9:30 am.
No proof of publication has been filed.
Petitioner must file proof of publication no later than one week before the continued hearing date.
Failure to do so will result in denial and dismissal of the petition without prejudice.
Court Clerk to give notice.
Ruling
LINDSEY ASHWORTH vs. PHILIP ASHWORTH
Jul 19, 2024 |
23FC08411
No appearances necessary. After review of the joint CMC statement filed by the parties, the matter is continued for further case management conference (CMC) to November 5, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3. A Family Law CMC Statement must be filed at least 15 days prior to the CMC. (https://www.amadorcourt.org/localForms/familyLaw/FamilyLaw_CMC-STATEMENT.pdf
Document
Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A. v. Wendy Wilson, The Board Of Managers Of The Arris Lofts Homeowners Association, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortgaged premises
Feb 26, 2024 |
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
704152/2024
Document
Mandy Fletcher, As Proposed Administrator Of The Estate Of Maison Callender, Mandy Fletcher, Individually v. Aaron D. Kessel M.D., Kelly Adams D.O., North Shore-Long Island Jewish Medical Center, North Shore-Long Island Jewish Health System, Inc., Northwell Health, Inc, Northwell Health-Cohen Children'S Medical Center
May 06, 2019 |
Peter J O'Donoghue |
Torts - Medical, Dental, or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Torts - Medical, Dental, or Podiatrist Malpractice |
707918/2019