Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Central Penn Capital Management Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Caruso, Michael Robert, against 82-02 45Th Ave. Corp., Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, James Kwang Lee, New York City Department Of Finance, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 7) See All represented by Kim, Daniel D., Schiavetta, Daniel Michael, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Leonard Livote presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 13, 2022RJI (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIRMATION - FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE
Date: June 13, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-I Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-H Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-J Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-G Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-H Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-I Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: September 14, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 21, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
January 11, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Plaintiff's letter in response to Defendant-Borrowers letter dated 1/9/2023 regarding insurance defa Plaintiff's letter in response to Defendant-Borrowers letter dated 1/9/2023 regarding insurance defa ... show more |
||
January 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter In Response to Plaintiff's Letter dated Jan 5, 2023 |
||
January 05, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) regarding Defendants on-going failure to insure property Redacted per 22 NYCRR regarding Defendants on-going failure to insure property Redacted |
||
December 07, 2022 |
ORDER - REFERENCE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. STIPULATION ATTACHED. |
||
December 06, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 21, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 21, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Mediation Stipulation |
||
November 17, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter to Judge Regarding Sur-Reply |
||
November 15, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter Seeking Permission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.