Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brigandi, John Edward, Levithan, Louis Anthony, Manfro, Jordan Jayce, Olson, Karen B., against Glenn A. Becker M.D., New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, Pauline Lovelace, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Thomas D Raffaele presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas D Raffaele Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 30, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 24, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #014)
Date: October 12, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE
Date: June 14, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: May 06, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #013)
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #013)
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #013)
Date: June 30, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #012)
Date: October 27, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-2 Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #015) JOE JARET TESTIFIED VIA LINKEDIN OF HIS EMPLOYMENT OVERLAPPING BOTH COMPANIES AND HIS SIGNATURE IS JOE JARET TESTIFIED VIA LINKEDIN OF HIS EMPLOYMENT OVERLAPPING BOTH COMPANIES AND HIS SIGNATURE IS ... show more |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #015) IDENTITY THEFT AFFIDAVIT WITH IRS PIN |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #015) FORENSIC AUDIT BLOOMBERG CUSIP REPORTS |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #015) ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE ASSIGNED IN 2015 WHICH MAKES IT 11 YEARS TOO LATE WHICH VOID ALL ASSIGNMENTS |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #015) ATTORNEY LETTER TO JUDGE SAYING UNBEKNOWNST TO HIS CLIENT THAT BK WAS FILED 3 MONTHS LATER ATTORNEY ATTORNEY LETTER TO JUDGE SAYING UNBEKNOWNST TO HIS CLIENT THAT BK WAS FILED 3 MONTHS LATER ATTORNEY ... show more |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #015) CERTIFIED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT INDEX NUMBER 23916 2010 WITH 14 PAGES AND NO NOTE ATTACHED |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #015) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE INDEX NUMBER 15328 2013 |
||
June 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #015) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/NOTARY ACKNOWLEGMENT |
||
June 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B-2 (Motion #015) CERTIFIED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT INDEX NUMBER 15328 2013 WITH 13 PAGES AND NO NOTE ATTACHED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.