Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ali-Ashraf Lodi, Anwar Hossain, Assaduzzaman Khan, Ataul Hoque, Frances Holland M.D., (total of 15) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Banks, Melissa Lauren, Gardner, George Clarence, Herskowitz, Arthur J, Mui, Ernie Tung-Ching, Saywack, Priam Samantha, (total of 6) See All against Anthony Subraj, Hillside Park 168 Llc, Zara Realty Holding Corp., represented by Henry, Leah Ariel, Ponkshe, Sameer Prabhu, Seusing, Christopher J., in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with THOMAS D. RAFFAELE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Rent Control Violation) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time681 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 18, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 03, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 14, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 13, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 02, 2019ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 13, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 27, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: March 26, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 27, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 08, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: May 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date:MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 30, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 17, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 17, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL
Date: May 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 25, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 27, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 27, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Stay TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN(T) (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
February 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ACTION STAYED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN(T) Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) SHORT FORM ORDER |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
May 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) PART 13 MOTIONS 040319, 2MOT 1SFO (Conversion) Judge: Healy, Hon. Maureen A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.