Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association As Trustee For Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-Wmc3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-Wmc3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Gulna Bila, Hamed Bila, Haro Bila, Jane Islam, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, (total of 10) See All represented by Mirro, Michele, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Leonard Livote presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard Livote Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
MEMORANDUM
Date: November 06, 2019ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: August 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 12, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: June 08, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 21, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002) DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE SEARCH RESULTS
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE
Date: September 15, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2023NOTICE
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 04, 2022SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2018MEMORANDUM
Date: January 29, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 27, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 09, 2019ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: June 17, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service |
||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) supplemental pleadings |
||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Proposed Long Form Order |
||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Short form order |
||
March 13, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #002) notice of settlement of judgment of foreclosure and sale |
||
March 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Lateness |
||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) order granting leave to amend and supplement pleadings |
||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service |
||
March 09, 2023 |
NOTICE Status Conference Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.