Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gb An Infant By His Mother And Natural Guardian Rayna Douglas, Rayna Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Baez, James Robert, Cantor, Eric Scott, Hoffman, Steven, Roer, David Lawrence, against Fast Lane Motors, Llc, Jevan De Jani Simpson, Kayde Palmer, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with PAM B. JACKMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePAM B. JACKMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management430 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: July 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 30, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 30, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 15, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 30, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 21, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 30, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 18, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: November 17, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 09, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 28, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 19, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
November 08, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #004) PART 19 MOTIONS Judge: Jackman-Brown, Hon. Pam B. |
|
September 28, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
September 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 28, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
September 27, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #004) PART 19 MOTIONS Judge: Jackman-Brown, Hon. Pam B. |
|
July 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.