Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Cathay Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jacobs, Joseph Stott, Levison, Michael H, against 32 Street Cm Llc A K A 32St Cm Llc A K A S32St Cm Llc, Bin Lin, John Does #1-50, The Last Fifty Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, New York City Department Of Finance, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 9) See All represented by Anderson, Yen-Yi, Chen, Jacob Yiping, Tsai, Victor W, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Supreme with Frederick D R. Sampson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick D R. Sampson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2024 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This legal document is a commercial mortgage foreclosure action filed by Cathay Bank in Queens County against multiple defendants, including individuals and entities with potential interests in a property located in Long Island City, New York. The ac...
ANSWER
Date: April 23, 2024ANSWER
Date: April 19, 2024ANSWER
Date: April 18, 2024ANSWER
Date: April 18, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 17, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 04, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 08, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
April 19, 2024 |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
||
April 18, 2024 |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
||
April 18, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
April 17, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER tipulation to Extend Time for Xuan Cheng to Answer Complaint |
||
April 04, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time for Shangri-La Astoria Inc. to Answer Complaint |
||
April 02, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 05, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on Bin Lin |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on New York State Department of Taxation and Finance |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on New York City Department of Finance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.