Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mintaka Financial, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Cuzin'S Duzin Corp, Todd L. Jones, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip Hom Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2021AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: September 14, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 14, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 23, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 11, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 31, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service by Mail for Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition |
||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition to Order to Show Cause (Mtn. Seq. 1) and Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
November 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 23, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 23, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) EMERGENCY WITH TRO |
||
September 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 14, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
September 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 14, 2021 | BILL OF COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.