Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
United Supply Company Dba, Usco Inc D B A United Supply Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ricciardi, John Joseph, Taroff, Lester P, against Joseph Madigan, Mccools And Son Heating And Air Conditioning Llc, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County. This case was filed in Putnam County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 25, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 25, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: October 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 25, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 25, 2021 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
October 25, 2021 | Affirmation as to Support | ||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C AOS, Email to D with Stip of Settlement |
||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Fully executed Stipulation of Settlement |
||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F AOS with Default Notice / email |
||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D AOS, Email with Fully executed Stip of Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.