Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Executive Risk Indemnity Inc Aso Jeremy Glick And Rebecca Glick, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Munger, Michael Scott, against Chefalo Carpentry & Construction Llc, Stephan Conklin, represented by Cheng, Otto, Jimenez, Alissa Aleksandra, Mazzarella, Christina A, Medina, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Gina C Capone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGina C Capone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 20, 2022STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2022STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 24, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 25, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON WRITTEN QUESTIONS
Date: September 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 02, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 30, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A - Damages
Date: March 30, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 17, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Good Faith Letter |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Exchanged emails to Coordinate Site Inspection |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) P's Note of Issue and Affirmation of Compliance |
||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Policy under separate cover |
||
February 17, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiffs Response To Notice For Discovery And Inspection |
||
January 24, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 14, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 13, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court: Compliance Conference |
||
August 04, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.