Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Oswego Co Ambulance & Hearse Serv Inc. D B A Menter Ambulance, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Mary Revoir, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a consumer credit transaction case filed in the Supreme Court of Oswego County, New York. The plaintiff, Oswego Co Ambulance & Hearse Serv Inc. doing business as Menter Ambulance, is suing the defendant, Mary Revoir, for an outstand...
AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 14, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 11, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 11, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT | ||
December 14, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Order to Vacate Judgment |
||
December 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 14, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non military |
||
December 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT SLE |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A military search |
||
December 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 11, 2023 | affidavit of facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.