Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Karaszewski, Darleen Veronica, against Scott Aka Hunneymam A K A Scott Hunneyman Jr, Scott Jr Aka Hunneyman, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: August 20, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 26, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) SCOTT HUNNEYMAM A/K/A SCOTT HUNNEYMAN JR |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.