Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maiden Reinsurance Company As Subrogee Of D&E Transport, Inc And D&E Transport, Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Altshiler, Florina, Horbatiuk, Kevin G, Welch, Timothy Paul, against Katalyst Worldwide, Inc And, Yoviel Marrero, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with James P Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time610 days |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: November 09, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 23, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2014ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2016DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 19, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: December 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Awarded monetary damages |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Maiden Decision |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #1) Decision on application for damages in lieu of an Inquest |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Anthony Grundman ISO Damages Inquest |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exh C - Progressive coverage determination letter |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exh B - Maiden Reinsurance Co. check |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exh A - Archival Claims Service damage estimate |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Walter Schultz Affidavit ISO Damages Inquest |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Exh D - NOE with Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.