Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pablo Enrique Umana Fonseca, An Incompetent, By His Guardian Ad Litem, Natalia Mayela Lott, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Adimey, Marijo Camille, Hershenhorn, Howard S, against Alisha Hemraj, Anupa Nadkarni, Dilpreet Kaur, Fahd Ali, Jessica Army, (total of 10) See All represented by Callery, Joseph Daniel, Fogel, Danielle Mikalajunas, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Deborah H Karalunas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 20, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: July 20, 2016NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: March 04, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 09, 2015PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 04, 2014NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 12, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: March 04, 2014ANSWER
Date: January 10, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 12, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 06, 2013LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 06, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 27, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 20, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 20, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 20, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 06, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 05, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 11, 2015ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 20, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 21, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 20, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 23, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 20, 2016ANSWER
Date: January 07, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 12, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 09, 2016COMPROMISE ORDER (CPLR 1207) (PROPOSED)
Date: July 20, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 18, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 24, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - .
Date: March 04, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 12, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 12, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: March 03, 2014ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2014EXHIBIT(S)
Date: January 07, 2014ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE
Date: January 10, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: July 20, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 05, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2017 |
ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE Amended Order |
||
September 27, 2016 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 15, 2016 |
ORDER - OTHER to settle and compromise |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Attorney's Affirmation - Ex. F - Disbursements |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Petition |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Attorney's Affirmation - Ex. B - Retainer Agreement |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney's Affirmation - Ex. A - Final Structured Settlement Benefits table |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Attorney's Affirmation - Ex. E - Commission |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Attorney's Affirmation - Ex. G - Letter to court |
||
July 20, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Attorney's Affirmation - Ex. C - Dr. Hootnick report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.