Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Keyman, Inc., filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Muldoon, James Raymond, against Baldwinsville Family Dental, Pllc, Gromedico, Llc, John Does 1-10, represented by Norton, Daniel Robert, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Hon. Danielle M Fogel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Foreclose Mechanics Lien) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 31, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 05, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 31, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 24, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 05, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 05, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Excerpts from Trubia deposition transcript |
||
November 14, 2023 |
SUR-REPLY (Motion #1) Sur-Reply Attorney Affirmation in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
||
November 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Dr Grossman's supporting deposition |
||
November 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 13, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) permitted to file 2 exhibits |
||
November 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.