Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Mr Cooper, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Edward A Godzac, Edward Godzac Aka, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: February 23, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: February 23, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 30, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: June 03, 2021ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 30, 2021FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: November 11, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Name |
||
November 11, 2021 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
November 11, 2021 | REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE | ||
October 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EF28 Notice of Conversion to E-file |
||
September 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
June 03, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Amended |
||
June 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (AMENDED) | ||
March 30, 2021 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) PROPOSED AMENDED JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.