Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Tobias Shelley As Sheriff Of Onondaga County, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Leclair, Paul L., Lefkowitz, Ryan, against The County Of Onondaga, The Onondaga County Legislature, represented by Felter, Karen Guyder, Katz, David M. G., Williams, Steven Ward, Yaus, Benjamin Michael, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 10, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 10, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 19, 2023PETITION
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 29, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: July 12, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 10, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 10, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 07, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Request for Adjournment |
||
December 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Tobias Shelley in Opposition |
||
November 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Exh 1 - Report |
||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Attorney Affirmation of Paul Leclair in Opposition |
||
November 30, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2) Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 19, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.