Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beverly Strachan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Defrancisco, Jeff D., against Riccelli Enterprises, Inc, Zachary W. Millix, represented by Otto, Susan Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with James P Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time915 days |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 08, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: June 11, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 17, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 31, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 24, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 01, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 01, 2019SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 04, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: July 08, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 15, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 31, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 11, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 04, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: April 05, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Subpoena Records Destruction Letters |
|
July 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled Murphy (Court Activity) Judge: Murphy, Hon. James P. |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Post-Settled Before Trial Murphy (Court Activity) Judge: Murphy, Hon. James P. |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Court advising the action is "settled subject" |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Transmittal of Case File to Judge DelConte. |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED Re: Superintendent of NYS Police |
|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Murphy (Court Activity)
Judge: Murphy, Hon. James P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.