Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Pathfinder Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Cedeno Real Estate Enterprises, Llc, Clara N Cedeno, La Patria Cafe, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Deborah H Karalunas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 06, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 20, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 01, 2021SUMMONS
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 01, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 02, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: March 02, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 08, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: April 15, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 18, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: July 25, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: June 07, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 03, 2022OATH
Date: April 15, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 15, 2022TERMS OF SALE
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 15, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 15, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Memorandum of Sale | ||
August 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
August 08, 2022 | Affidavit of Posting | ||
August 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 08, 2022 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
July 25, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
June 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
June 10, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.