Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Shateek Brown, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Eric Patrick, against Andrew Petrus, Madison Parkhurst, Nikki Parkhurst, represented by Gaetano, Joseph Anthony, Norfleet, Kristin Lewis, Savage, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Robert E Antonacci presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2021RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 27, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 27, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 27, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 19, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: November 01, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 03, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 28, 2022STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 28, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 28, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 27, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) SDA PARTIAL AS TO PARKHURSTS' |
||
February 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) of Judgment After Motion with Bill of Costs |
||
February 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) of electronically filed Notice of Entry of entered Judgment After Motion with Bill of Costs via NYSC of electronically filed Notice of Entry of entered Judgment After Motion with Bill of Costs via NYSC ... show more |
||
February 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
February 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 03, 2022 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of costs - revised |
||
February 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 02, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR PC 2-22-22 (Blank Sched Order attached) |
||
February 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) of Kristin L. Norfleet, Esq., with Statement of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.