Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Douglas J. Pick, As Assignee For The Benefit Of Creditors Of Schiff Fine Arts, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Pick, Douglas J, against Lisa Schiff, represented by Cahill, John Robert, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Shahabuddeen Ally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShahabuddeen Ally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 02, 2024MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 26, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 26, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 18, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 18, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: December 18, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
January 02, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 02, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) SFA-Pick Filed Assignment |
||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Pick-Wilk Auslander Email Compilation |
||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit 7.20.2023 and 7.17.2023 emails |
||
December 26, 2023 | MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit.7.13.2023 and 8.9.2023 emails |
||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit.8.4.2023 email |
||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit-7.20.2023 and 7.17.2023 emails , |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.