Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Clearwater Ventures, Inc., Lisa Abrams, Lisa Abrams In Her Capacity As Trustee For The Lisa Marie Abrams Revocable Trust, Marcus Abrams, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Hynes, Katherine Vance, Serritella, James R, Simpkins, Charles Claudio, Smith, Jason James, against Aracar Financiera, S.A., Aracar Group Holdings Corp., Aracar Group Spv Ii Llc, Aracar Servicios, S.A., Carcorp, S.A., (total of 10) See All represented by Singer, Daniel A, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Joel M. Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoel M. Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 (Arbitration) - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 27, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: July 19, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I-9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 08, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: March 08, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023JUDGMENT - MONEY
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I-7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I-3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K-4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I-4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K-3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - HH Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 23, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: December 23, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 23, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: December 23, 2022PETITION
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT - MONEY entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 22, 2023 | ||
July 28, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
July 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001) notice of appeal-decision and order-informational statement-affirmation of service |
||
July 19, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Transcript of June 9, 2023 Oral Argument on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award |
||
June 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 28, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Motion to Seal |
||
June 28, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award |
||
March 10, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) Petitioners' Reply in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award |
||
March 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Arbitration Award |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.