Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Abnb Investment Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pollack, Gayle E, Rose, Collin Andrew, against Mann Capital Group, Llc, Mcgi Group Llc, Michael Mann, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lyle E. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLyle E. Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 *Corrected*
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 *Corrected*
Date: November 17, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2022ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: November 29, 2022RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 25, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: November 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 20, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) Letter requesting that this Court strike the unauthorized reply affirmation Defendants filed in this Letter requesting that this Court strike the unauthorized reply affirmation Defendants filed in this ... show more |
||
February 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Exhibit G- email dated January 17, 2023. |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Exhibit D- email to Jeff Chabrowne dated December 21, 2022 |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Exhibit E- Notice of Subpoena to TD Bank |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Exhibit F- TD Bank Account Statement |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Exhibit B- email to Mr. Mann dated September 9, 2022 |
||
February 07, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) *Corrected* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Vacate |
||
February 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Gayle Pollack |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Exhibit A- email to Mr. Mann dated September 2, 2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.