Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chapman Roberts, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hoffmann, Emma Jane, Leichtman, David, Wax, Shane David, against Broadway Asia Company, L.L.C., Concord Theatricals Corp., Leiber Stoller Productions, Inc., Mike Stoller, Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Giger, Matthew H, Saperstein, Ivan Adam, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouis L. Nock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Unjust Enrichment) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: December 08, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 08, 2023RJI (AMENDED)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 20, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 08, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: January 11, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: December 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: December 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 08, 2023RJI (AMENDED)
Date: November 22, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 08, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2023SUMMONS
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
January 23, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 11, 2024 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
December 13, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint in this Action |
||
December 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Other Order - Non-Motion in Prior Action disposing of Case |
||
December 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 8/9/22 First Department Order |
||
December 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.