Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ehrlich Gayner, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gayner, Charles John, against Matthew Gates, represented by Levenson, Brian Seth, Roth, Richard A., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Suzanne J. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzanne J. Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 09, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 09, 2024ANSWER
Date: December 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 22, 2024ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M-A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2024NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Judgment Notice of Entry
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 31, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 04, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 |
SUR-REPLY (Motion #002) Gates Sur-Reply |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Crim Retainer |
||
January 24, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit Ehrlich Opp to Cross and Reply |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M-A (Motion #002) Memo Ex A (Case Law) |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Emails and Texts |
||
January 24, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Reply to Notice to Admit |
||
January 24, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit Gayner Opp to Cross and Reply |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Affidavit of Svc on Gates in Landlord Case |
||
January 24, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Memo of Law |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Judgment Notice of Entry Judgment Notice of Entry Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.