Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Plymouth Street Llc, Derivatively On Behalf Of Gold Capital Fund Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bertaccini, Daniel Noah, Sasson, Moshe, against Abraham Sitt, Dumbo Capital Holdings Llc, Gold Capital Fund Llc, Simmons Capital Llc, represented by Borelli, John Anthony, Rebhun, Jason J., Tracy, Alexandrea, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Jennifer G. Schecter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer G. Schecter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other - Commercial Division (Breach Of Fiduciary Duty) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: November 27, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: January 07, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 08, 2024INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 21, 2023STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 20, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: November 27, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 04, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 25, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 22, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 21, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 29, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 30, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 05, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (POST RJI)
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 25, 2024 |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stip Amending PCO |
||
January 08, 2024 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of change of address |
||
January 07, 2024 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
December 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
December 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff Document Demand to Defendants |
||
December 20, 2023 |
INTERROGATORIES Plaintiff Interrogatories to Defendants |
||
December 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Plaintiff Notice of Deposition of Defendants |
||
December 12, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Defendants' Demand for the Production of Documents and Things |
||
December 05, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.