Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Walter L Stipa Sprecase, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Karamouzis, Andrew P., Robayna, Eduardo R., against Carla M Braschi-Karam De Tenreiro, Daniel Tenreiro, represented by Bamberger, David Edgar, Emanuel, Stephanie Elizabeth, Montgomery, James Ardran, Rapaport, Martin S, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Sabrina Kraus presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management245 days |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Plaintiff Walter L. Stipa Sprecase ("Plaintiff") brings this action for damages that exceed $15,000.00, exclusive of interests, costs, and fees, against Defendant Daniel Tenreiro ("Defendant"). The complaint alleges the following: Plaintiff and Defen...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 01, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 22, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B5 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Grid Time Promissory Note
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Collateral Agreement
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B6 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Collateral Agreement
Date: June 06, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 01, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 07, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 27, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2019STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 03, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: September 10, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Collateral Agreement
Date: September 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Collateral Agreement 2.20.15
Date: September 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 02, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 01, 2019THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: October 01, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 01, 2019ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Grid Time Promissory Noted dated 2.20.15
Date: September 11, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2018ANSWER
Date: August 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 29, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 02, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 22, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 06, 2018SUMMONS
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B4 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B3 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: July 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 28, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: July 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 15, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 29, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 21, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: July 09, 2020ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 26, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 21, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 21, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 05, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: October 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 27, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 22, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009) May 2013 Account Statement
Date: March 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011) May 2013 Account Statement
Date: March 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 03, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 12, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 14, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 16, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 16, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 03, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2020AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO JUDGMENT PROPOSED 02 25 2020, NYSCEF 152
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: March 03, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 03, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 03, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Notice of Entry and Order
Date: February 25, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #017) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 03, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 03, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 03, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Attorneys' Bill of Fees
Date: February 25, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: February 21, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 21, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 03, 2020MEMORANDUM
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006) MK Redacted Invoices from 1.18.20-7.1.20
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006) ARHMF's Invoices from 12.12.18
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #018)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006) MK Redacted Invoices from 12.12.18 - 1.17.20
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 13, 2021SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 13, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #016) *Corrected*
Date: October 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: June 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #014) *Corrected*
Date: June 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 13, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020) Collateral Agreement dated 2.20.15
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 10, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #014)
Date: June 01, 2021SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: June 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020) Collateral Agreement dated 5.7.13
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #014)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: August 29, 2022STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #013) May 2013 Account Statement
Date: March 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 23, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 18, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: July 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 23, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: July 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010) May 2013 Account Statement
Date: March 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012) May 2013 Account Statement
Date: March 23, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 18, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 16, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #017)
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #017)
Date: March 06, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2022SIGNED DECISION/ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #024)
Date: September 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #024)
Date: September 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #022)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #022)
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 18, 2022JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION *Corrected*
Date: May 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #017)
Date: March 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 14, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #018)
Date: February 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #017)
Date: March 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #018)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #017)
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #018)
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #020)
Date: February 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #018)
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #018)
Date: January 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 28, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #017)
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: March 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #022)
Date: April 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #022)
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #021) Exhibit A - Summary of Payments
Date: February 01, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: February 22, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #021)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #020) Bank statement (redacted)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 10, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: November 28, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #025)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 10, 2023PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: October 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 10, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 10, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS Notice of Filing and Cont'd Deposition Transcript of D. Tenreiro 11.11.21
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #025)
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #024) Letter and check from Hancock Ins. Co.
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #024)
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #024)
Date: September 07, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #024)
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #024)
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #025)
Date: October 03, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #024)
Date: September 21, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #024)
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #025)
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #025)
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #025)
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #024)
Date: August 22, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: September 08, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #024)
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #024)
Date: August 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #023)
Date: July 30, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER - INTERIM (NON-MOTION)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #023)
Date: July 30, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #023)
Date: July 31, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #023)
Date: July 30, 2023DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #023)
Date: July 30, 2023BILL OF COSTS AS PER APPELLATE DIVISION ORDER
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER - PRE-TRIAL
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2023REMITTITUR
Date: June 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #021)
Date: December 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #022)
Date: May 17, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #021)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #017)
Date: December 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #022)
Date: March 23, 2023BILL OF COSTS AS PER APPELLATE DIVISION ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: May 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: December 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #022)
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #021)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020) Exhibit A - Summary of Payments
Date: February 01, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #021)
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #020)
Date: February 01, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #021)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #021)
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #020)
Date: February 01, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #020)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #021)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 28, 2022DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 23, 2024 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL | ||
November 20, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 19, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #025) | ||
October 16, 2023 | PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM | ||
October 10, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Deposition of Plaintiff 11-16-2021 |
||
October 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Trial subpoena accepted by S. Emanuel, Esq. |
||
October 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter re testimony of S. Emanuel, Esq. |
||
October 10, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Notice of Filing and Deposition Transcript of C. Tenreiro 11.30.21 |
||
October 10, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Notice of Filing and Cont'd Deposition Transcript of D. Tenreiro 11.11.21 Notice of Filing and Cont'd Deposition Transcript of D. Tenreiro 11.11.21 Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.