Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bankers Standard Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Russell Umphenour And Debra London, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Keeffe, Marina, Stern, Robert Ashley, against Nj Paz Painting Services, Inc., North Moore Nyc Property, Inc., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Debra A James presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 23, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time884 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 24, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2018COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 03, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
October 24, 2019 | Hearing |
DISMISSED PRE-NOTE IAS PART 59 10:30AM SEE NYSCEF DOC #13. Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 05, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
August 28, 2018 | Motion |
EXTEND TIME (Motion #001) Decided: 12/14/2018SEE DECISION Before Justice: JAMES, DEBRA A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001) | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Correspondence |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.