Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Luxury Mortgage Corp., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kleinberg, Pamela L, against Stephen J. Beninati, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eileen Rakower presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial (General) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2016ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: February 12, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 07, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 27, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2016ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: May 09, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: February 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Discharge Fox Rothschild LLP and Continue Pro Se |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
June 07, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 15EFM 9:30AM Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002) | |
May 17, 2016 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (71 THOMAS ST) (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 15EFM 9:30AM Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002) | |
April 12, 2016 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (71 THOMAS ST) (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 15EFM 9:30AM Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002) Stipulation of Adjournment of Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.