Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bradley A. Carmel Living Trust, Candace Carmel Barasch, Michael A. Barasch, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Castner, Laura Diane, Edelman, Nina T., Horn, Eric Howard, Lerner, Richard E., Lindstrom, Wendy Jeanne, (total of 6) See All against Does 1-10, Lisa Schiff, Schiff Fine Art Llc, Sfa Advisory Llc, represented by Adelman, Ronald Wolf, Cahill, John Robert, Pick, Douglas J, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Nicholas Moyne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNicholas Moyne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 17, 2024LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT (RELATED ACTION)
Date: December 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 15, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 01, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: July 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 31, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B SFA Chapter 7 - Summons |
||
December 29, 2023 | LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT (RELATED ACTION) | ||
November 29, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiffs' Subpoena to D Pick |
||
November 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) L Castner Reply AFF |
||
November 29, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
November 15, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Email re: Consolidation |
||
November 13, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) October 27, 2023 E-Mail to John Cahill |
||
November 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Pick Affirmation Re: "Pro Bono" Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.