Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rajendra Aggarwal, Individually, And As A Member Of 343 West 46 Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Crawford, Allyn James, against 343 West 46 Llc, Maurice Berabi, Individually And As A Member Of 343 West 46 Llc, Micha Kalbo, Individually And As A Member Of 343 West 46 Llc, represented by Donovan, Joseph T, Kaufman, Dena Copulsky, Nash, Kevin J., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 24, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 24, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 16, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: May 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 14, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
July 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 343 West 46 LLC |
||
July 14, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
July 14, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
July 05, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
June 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
June 16, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
May 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Notice of Defendants' Intention to Arbitrate |
||
May 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Operating Agreement of 343 West 46 LLC |
||
May 31, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) To Compel Arbitration and Stay Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.