Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Dawei Zhao, Linyu Hu, More Views Inc, Nu Media Llc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Berger, James Casey, Kung, Hsien Chih, Stern, Richard Adam, against Universal Processing Llc, represented by Brinen, Joshua David, Ross, Matthew James, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard G. Latin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 20, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 12, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 20, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 12, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 08, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 12, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: January 24, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023PETITION
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN | ||
January 23, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 22, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #003) Instagram Evidence of Breaching Activity - General Advertising |
||
January 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #003) Website Evidence of Breaching Activity - Services Advertising |
||
January 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #003) Website Evidence of Breaching Activity - Services Advertising |
||
January 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #003) Evidence Related to Yelp Relationship |
||
January 20, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) Affirmation Supporting Proposed Order from Corporate Officer Fact Witness - Exhibits to Follow |
||
January 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Meetings-related Evidence of Breaching Activity |
||
January 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) International Online Evidence of Breaching Activity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.