Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ana Cavatore, Facundo Proske, Francisco Proske, Hadassah, The Women'S Zionist Organization Of America, Inc., Jewish Guild For The Blind, (total of 17) See All filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kaye, Lawrence Michael, Rowland, David John, Spiegler, Howard Neil, Weitz, Yael Miriam, against The Solomon R. Guggenheim Foundation, represented by Perez-Marques, Antonio J., Stern, Caroline B, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Andrew Borrok presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: August 31, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Date: March 21, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 16, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: January 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Justice Borrok Dated 12/07/2023 Providing Supplemental Authority |
||
November 17, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
October 06, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT |
||
September 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
August 31, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
August 24, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #002) Proposed Stipulation and Scheduling Order |
||
July 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Plaintiffs' Original Complaint |
||
July 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Letter from D. Catton Rich to E. Adler, dated 09/27/1974 |
||
July 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Guggenheim Gets Major Art Works, N.Y. Times, dated 10/24/1963 |
||
July 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Cross-Complaint of Thomas C. Bennigson, dated 12/10/2004 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.