Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Menlo Energy Florida, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Costigan, William F., Kapin, Michael Jonathan, against Abc Corporations I-Ix, Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London Are Names-Members Of Lloyds Syndicates 510, 1084, 3000, 2623, 623, 2121, 1036, 4444, 958, 33, 4000, 2003, 1880, 510, 5000, 609, 5151, 4020 And Great Lakes Reinsurance, Gcube Insurance Services, Inc., Gcube Underwriting Limited, represented by Furman, Andrew J, Gross, Jack, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Andrew S Borrok presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management942 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #003)
Date: April 11, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 11, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: April 20, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: January 02, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005)
Date: January 03, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005)
Date: December 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: June 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005)
Date: November 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005)
Date: January 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: November 17, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 09, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 22, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 23, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: April 19, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 15, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: November 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2016DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion #002)
Date: December 16, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: June 24, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: May 03, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 12, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 14, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: December 19, 2014ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: April 11, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 04, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 08, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 02, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: January 11, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2016STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: March 15, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: July 29, 2015ORDER - RESTORATION (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: September 17, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #006) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE STIP Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
January 22, 2021 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #006) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE STIP Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
December 18, 2020 | Motion |
DISMISS (Motion #006) Before Justice: BORROK, ANDREW Answer demanded: Yes Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
April 17, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE IAS PRE-TRIAL 53 11:30 A Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 53 11:30AM Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 22, 2020 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRE-TRIAL 53 11:30AM NOI TBF 12/31/2019 Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.