Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rli Insurance Company For Itself And As Subrogee Assignee Of Techno Consult Inc. And William Dobson, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Delahunt, Timothy Erin, against The Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey, represented by Ahmed, Sajaa Sameeha, Castillo, Andres Jose, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Nancy Bannon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management247 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1239 days |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 22, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 10, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 02, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: January 14, 2020MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 04, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001) | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Informational Statement |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Decision with Notice of Entry |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Entry Of Order And Judgment Of The Honorable Nancy M. Bannon, J.S.C. Dated June 2, 2020 | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Email Correspondence |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Email Correspondence |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REJECTION (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.