Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Linda A Lacewell, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (New York Ins. Law Art. 74) case represented by Cohen, Donald N., Franceschetti, Jack Anthony, Gagion, Leo Vincent, Kim, Stephanie, Pisapia, Melissa Amelia, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Verna L. Saunders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVerna L. Saunders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (New York Ins. Law Art. 74) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 24, 2021PETITION *Corrected*
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 24, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 26, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 24, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Decree Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 24, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: January 31, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 31, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 18, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Plaintiff's Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 25, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 08, 2022ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Stipulation of Settlement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 18, 2022ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 25, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION JAF Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 23, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Attorney letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Release Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT
Date: September 20, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 18, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 18, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: December 02, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 25, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Decree Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT
Date: June 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 23, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 23, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 23, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 13, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 28, 2021STIPULATION - AS DIRECTED BY COURT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
March 07, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #003) No Fee Letter |
||
March 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Ex. A - Proposed Order |
||
March 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) Affirmation in Support |
||
March 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Ex. D - Final Determination Letter |
||
March 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Ex. B - Denial Letter |
||
March 07, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) OSC - Adjudication Procedure |
||
March 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Ex. C - No-Fault Denial of Claim Form |
||
February 07, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
January 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Stipulation of Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.